EP1918751 - Microscope system, observation method and observation program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Tatsuki 1692-11, Yamadamachi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0933 / JP | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022728.7 | 31.10.2006 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918751 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918751 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B21/36 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
G02B21/367 (EP);
G02B21/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/03] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikroskopsystem, Beobachtungsverfahren und Beobachtungsprogramm | [2008/19] | English: | Microscope system, observation method and observation program | [2008/19] | French: | Système de microscope, procédé d'observation et programme d'observation | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9839728 (BACUS RES LAB INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,3,4 * figures 1-3,9a,9b,10 * * page 7, line 2 - page 12, line 11 * * page 19, line 34 - page 23, line 32 * * page 30, line 1 - page 32, line 37 * * page 40, line 1 - page 47, line 5 *; | [XY]EP0994433 (FAIRFIELD IMAGING LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0036] * * figure - * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]WO0127678 (CELLAVISION AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * page 2, line 2 - page 4, line 28 * * page 6, line 7 - page 8, line 25 *; | [Y]US2005190437 (NAKAGAWA SHUJI [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0049] *; | [Y]EP1617377 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] *; | [X]US2006204072 (WETZEL ARTHUR W [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0046] * |