EP1785284 - Pneumatic tire with cushion rubber and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, 3-chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9, 3-chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Norio Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Masanori Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Maruoka, Kiyoto Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
Hayashi, Norio Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd., 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Takahashi, Masanori Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd., 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Maruoka, Kiyoto Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd., 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022749.3 | 31.10.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | JP20050325137 | 09.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005325137 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785284 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785284 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1785284 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/22, B29D30/30, B60C9/18, B60C11/01 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
B29D30/3028 (EP,US);
B60C11/01 (EP,US);
B60C9/185 (EP);
B60C2200/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/16] | B60C9/22, B29D30/30, B60C9/18 | ||
Former IPC [2007/20] | B60C9/22, B29D30/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2012/52] |
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugluftreifen mit Schulterpolster und Methode der Herstellung diese Reifens | [2007/20] | English: | Pneumatic tire with cushion rubber and method for producing the same | [2007/20] | French: | Pneumatique avec épaulette et sa methode de fabrication | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 19.10.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000025413 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract *; | [X]EP1167079 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0018]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1201414 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0022] , [0034] , [0044] , [0045]; figures 2,3e,3f,; claim - * |