EP1795310 - Tool with contactless switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth AG Heidehofstrasse 31 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieler, Michael Schumannweg 11 73614 Schorndorf / DE | 02 /
Zurawski, Manfred Luipenstrasse 2 74417 Gschwend / DE | 03 /
Henzler, Günter Weilstetter Weg 3 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Fluhrer, Andreas Haselweg 8 71540 Murrhardt / DE | 05 /
Kiesslich, Marcus Löwensteiner Weg 17 71522 Backnang / DE | 06 /
Scharfenberg, Andreas Zügelstrasse 9 71540 Murrhardt / DE | [2007/24] | Application number, filing date | 06022783.2 | 02.11.2006 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | DE20051058613 | 07.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005058613 | [2007/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1795310 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1795310 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,US);
H01H2003/0293 (EP,US);
H01H9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Title | German: | Werkzeug mit berührungslosem Schalter | [2007/24] | English: | Tool with contactless switch | [2007/24] | French: | Outil avec interrupteur agissant sans contact | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2006 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | IT | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | NL | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | ES | 30.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | AT | 02.11.2013 | GB | 02.11.2013 | IE | 02.11.2013 | LU | 02.11.2013 | BE | 30.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
AT | 02.11.2013 | ||
GB | 02.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
AT | 02.11.2013 | ||
GB | 02.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
GB | 02.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/42] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 19.06.2013 | |
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 19.06.2013 | |
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 19.06.2013 | |
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06205732 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,3* abstract *; | [X]DE10315980 (CREDO TECHNOLOGY CORP BROADVIE [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0016] * |