EP1744575 - Configurable modulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2010/22] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St. Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Medlock, Joel D. 15745 Shannon Road Los Gatos CA 95032 / US | 02 /
Jha, Uma 1136 Soto Place Placentia CA 92870 / US | 03 /
Holmes, David M. 21696 Noonan Court Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022870.7 | 03.08.2001 | [2007/03] | Priority number, date | US20000222853P | 03.08.2000 Original published format: US 222853 P | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1744575 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1744575 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1744575 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40, H04L27/34, H04L27/36 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
H04B1/04 (EP,US);
H04B1/38 (EP,US);
H04B1/406 (EP,US);
H04B7/06 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/03] | H04Q7/32, H04B1/40, H04L27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/52] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Konfigurierbarer Modulator | [2007/03] | English: | Configurable modulator | [2007/03] | French: | Modulateur configurable | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01963803.0 / EP1316193 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | GB | 03.08.2010 | FR | 31.08.2010 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/35] | FI | 17.03.2010 | |
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | FI | 17.03.2010 | |
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 17.03.2010 | |
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | FI | 17.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5745527 (KELTON JAMES ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 47 - line 67; figure 1 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 23 * * column 5, line 36 - line 44 *; | [Y]US5825242 (PRODAN RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * column 5, line 11 - line 18 *; | [A] - GUNN J E ET AL, A LOW-POWER DSP CORE-BASED SOFTWARE RADIO ARCHITECTURE, IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 574-590, (199904), ISSN 0733-8716, XP000824304 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [00D.] , [001.] , [00D.] , [004.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.761037 |