EP1772356 - Composite body for a golf car and utility vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/15] | Composite body for a golf car and utility vehicle | ||
[2009/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Club Car, LLC 4125 Washington Road Evans, GA 30809 / US | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Club Car Inc. 4125 Washington Road Augusta, GA 30907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bataille, Steven Robert 188 Morgan Bussey Road Edgefield, SC 29224 / US | 02 /
Crow, Douglas T. 4011 Villa Lane Martinez, GA 30907 / US | 03 /
Hardy, David R. 2101 Mims Road Hephzibah, GA 30815 / US | 04 /
Lewis, Gary L. 911 Burlington Drive Evans, GA 30809 / US | 05 /
Morgan, Paul E. P.O. Box 250 Appling, GA 30802 / US | 06 /
Mulgrew, Peter A. 2660B Havenwood Drive Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US | 07 /
Newman, Duane E. 552 Brandermill Road Evans, GA 30809 / US | 08 /
Skelton, Gerald C. 1333 Shadow Oak Drive Evans, GA 30809 / US | 09 /
Stewart, Geoff D. 821 Windmill Crossing Evans, GA 30809 / US | 10 /
Welsh, Michal L. 1380 Waterston Drive Evans, GA 30809 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
Bataille, Steven Robert 188 Morgan Bussey Road Edgefield, SC 29224 / US | ||
02 /
Crow, Douglas T. 4011 Villa Lane Martinez, GA 30907 / US | |||
03 /
Hardy, David R. 2101 Mims Road Hephzibah, GA 30815 / US | |||
04 /
Lewis, Gary L. 911 Burlington Drive Evans, GA 30809 / US | |||
05 /
Morgan, Paul E. P.O. Box 85 Appling, GA 30802 / US | |||
06 /
Mulgrew, Peter A. 2660B Havenwood Drive Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US | |||
07 /
Newman, Duane E. 552 Brandermill Road Evans, GA 30809 / US | |||
08 /
Skelton, Gerald C. 4120 Trenton Way Martinez, GA 30907 / US | |||
09 /
Stewart, Geoff D. 821 Windmill Crossing Evans, GA 30809 / US | |||
10 /
Welsh, Michal L. 1380 Waterston Drive Evans, GA 30809 / US | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022935.8 | 23.01.2004 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | US20030442192P | 24.01.2003 Original published format: US 442192 P | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772356 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1772356 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | [2009/07] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1772356 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1772356 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1772356 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | [2012/18] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1772356 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D29/04 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
B62D29/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB [2007/15] | Title | German: | Aufbau aus Verbundwerkstoff für einen Golfwagen oder Nutzfahrzeug | [2007/15] | English: | Composite body for a golf car and utility vehicle | [2009/07] | French: | Carrosserie composite de voiturette de golf ou de véhicule de service | [2007/15] |
Former [2007/15] | Composite body for a golf car and utility vehicle | Examination procedure | 03.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04704832.7 / EP1592604 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040704832) is 16.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0438546 (LANKER WILLI) [X] 1-13 * column 4, line 16 - column 4, line 55; figure 1b; claims 1,11-14 *; | [X]WO9714602 (CHRYSLER CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5238267 (HUTCHISON WAYNE R [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5193635 (MIZUNO YUTAKA [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1380496 (ET S.R.L. [IT]) [PA] 1-13 * the whole document * |