EP1783985 - Mobile terminal and method for changing screen mode thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Gong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Wan-Kyu Jugong 2-Cha Apt. 204-601 Daebang-Dong Dongjak-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yang, Ji-Sun Jeongdo Apt. 3-204 408-9 Yuljeon-Dong Jangan-Gu Suwon Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
Song, Bo-Hyun 1363-10 Pyeongni 4-Dong Seo-Gu Daegu / KR | [2012/10] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
Park, Wan-Kyu Jugong 2-Cha Apt. 204-601 Daebang-Dong Dongjak-Gu Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Yang, Ji-Sun Jeongdo Apt. 3-204 408-9 Yuljeon-Dong Jangan-Gu Suwon Gyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
03 /
Song, Bo-Hyun 1363-10 Pyeongni 4-Dong Seo-Gu Daegu / KR | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023074.5 | 06.11.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | KR20050105927 | 07.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050105927 | KR20060039313 | 01.05.2006 Original published format: KR 20060039313 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783985 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1783985 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
H04M1/0243 (EP,US);
H04M1/0227 (EP,US);
H04M1/0233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Verfahren zum Ändern des Anzeigemodus dafür | [2007/19] | English: | Mobile terminal and method for changing screen mode thereof | [2007/19] | French: | Terminal mobile et procédé pour changer des modes d'écran correspondant | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.10.2011 | 26.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2006 | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | IE | 06.11.2012 | LU | 06.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.11.2012 | ||
LU | 06.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001156893 (NEC SAITAMA LTD) [Y] 5,6 * figures 9-12 *; | [X]DE10109102 (WINTER GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]EP1298890 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,22,23,25,26 * abstract * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0082]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0114]; figure 12 * [Y] 5,6,12-17,19-21,24; | [YA]WO2005026562 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP], et al) [Y] 13-17,19-21,24 * the whole document * [A] 18; | [X]US2005130715 (FUJISAWA EIZO [JP]) [X] 25-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0083]; figures 6-16 *; | [YA]EP1564971 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055]; figures 11,12 * [A] 22,23,25,26; | [A]WO2005104505 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 9,10* abstract * | Examination | EP1768357 | by applicant | EP1298890 | WO2005026562 | EP1768357 |