EP1785470 - Composition comprising a sulfur- and phosphorus-containing compound, and/or its salt, and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/20] | Composition comprising a sulfur-containing, phosphorus-containing compound, and/or its salt, and uses thereof | ||
[2014/19] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Afton Chemical Corporation 500 Spring Street Richmond, VA 23219 / US | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeGonia, David J. 12708 Clearwater Drive Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | 02 /
Hewette, Chip 1813 Rolfe Way Richmond, Virginia 23238 / US | 03 /
Sheets, Roger M. 10905 Tray Way Glen Allen, Virginia 23060 / US | 04 /
Phillips, Ronald L. 11305 Dunbrook Road Richmond, Virginia 23235 / US | 05 /
Loper, John T. 1703 Habwood Lane Richmond, Virginia 23238 / US | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023236.0 | 08.11.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | US20060372183 | 09.03.2006 Original published format: US 372183 | US20050734757P | 09.11.2005 Original published format: US 734757 P | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785470 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785470 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C10M137/10, C07F9/165, C07F9/6571 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
C10M137/105 (EP,US);
C07F9/16 (KR);
C07F9/165 (KR);
C07F9/1652 (EP,US);
C07F9/657118 (EP,US);
F16H57/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/043 (EP,US);
C10M2223/047 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/08 (EP,US);
C10N2030/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung enthaltend eine schwefel- und phosphorhaltige Verbindung, und/oder deren Salz, und deren Verwendung | [2014/19] | English: | Composition comprising a sulfur- and phosphorus-containing compound, and/or its salt, and uses thereof | [2014/19] | French: | Composition comprenant un composé sulfuré et phosphoré, et/ou son sel, et utilisations de celui-ci | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/20] | Eine schwefel- und phosphorhaltige Verbindung und/oder deren Salz enthaltende Zusammensetzung und deren Verwendung | ||
Former [2007/20] | Composition comprising a sulfur-containing, phosphorus-containing compound, and/or its salt, and uses thereof | Examination procedure | 08.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 16.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2014 | 10.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1268562 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US4370247 (OSTYN MARCEL A [FR]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [A]EP0578435 (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 1859471, XP002427219 [X] 23-25 * column A * | [X] - M. MIKOLAJCZYK, J. LUCZAK, "Stereochemistry of Organophosphorus Cyclic Compounds", TETRAHEDRON, (1972), vol. 28, pages 5411 - 5422, XP002417564 [X] 1,2,4 * page 5419 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)93865-7 | [X] - W. KUDELSKA, M. MICHALSKA, "O,O-Dialkylphosphoro-thioic and -dithioic Acids as Fucntionalising Reagents of Monosaccharides", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1980), vol. 83, pages 43 - 49, XP002417563 [X] 1-5,21 * table II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)85362-8 | [X] - M. MICHALSKA, J. MICHALSKI, I. ORLICH, "Glycosylation of Organic Thio- and Selenoacids of Phosphorus", TETRAHEDRON, (1972), vol. 34, pages 617 - 622, XP002424356 [X] 1-5,21 * page 618 * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, (19890629), URL: BEILSTEIN, XP002417703 [X] 1-5,21 * the whole document * |