EP1786203 - Reproduction system and server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujie, Hidekatsu Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1 Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023266.7 | 08.11.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | JP20050326113 | 10.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005326113 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1786203 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1786203 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/775 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04L65/613 (EP,US);
H04L65/765 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04N21/232 (EP,US);
H04N21/2402 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2011/32] |
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wiedergabesystem und Server | [2007/20] | English: | Reproduction system and server | [2007/20] | French: | Système de reproduction et serveur | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 02.06.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1213926 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 4 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] * * figure 4 and 7 * [I] 1-3; | [A]US2005097618 (ARLING PAUL D [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US2005216946 (JOHNSON DAN S [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 and 5 * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049] ** paragraph [0073] * |