EP1921225 - Forming board with bracing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FWR Solutions GmbH Schafgasse 8 96342 Stockheim/Ofr. / DE | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Willibald Schafgasse 8 96342 Stockheim/Ofr. / DE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023370.7 | 09.11.2006 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1921225 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1921225 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04G17/14 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
E04B1/6806 (EP);
E04B2005/322 (EP);
E04B2005/324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Schalungsteil mit Versteifungseinrichtung | [2008/20] | English: | Forming board with bracing device | [2008/20] | French: | Élément de coffrage avec raidissement | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 08.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | IE | 01.07.2009 | IT | 01.07.2009 | LT | 01.07.2009 | LV | 01.07.2009 | NL | 01.07.2009 | PL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | ES | 12.10.2009 | IS | 01.11.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | AT | 09.11.2009 | LU | 09.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
AT | 09.11.2009 | ||
LU | 09.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
AT | 09.11.2009 | ||
LU | 09.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
AT | 09.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
AT | 09.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | EE | 01.07.2009 | |
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | EE | 01.07.2009 | |
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | EE | 01.07.2009 | |
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0532908 (FISCHER WILLIBALD [DE]) [A] 1,11,12 * figure 1; claim 1 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 3 *; | [A]DE9419215U (RACHL HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-3* figure 2 *; | [A]DE29703937U (TILETSCHKE LOTHAR [DE]) [A] 11,12 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE29606217U (DAUSEND HANS WERNER [DE]) [A] 11 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE29901159U (PECON AG [CH]) [A] 11 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE10037193 (FISCHER WILLIBALD [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 13 * |