EP1785264 - Apparatus and process for making an elastic band [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Raychem GmbH Finsinger Feld 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beer, Alexander Parforceheide 99 14163 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Glaue, Andreas Drakestrasse 53 12205 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kunzmann, Jens-Peter Hansastrasse 94 13088 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Dohnke, Ingo Heidestrasse 22B 14513 Teltow / DE | 05 /
Pfeiffer, Bernhard Bamberger Strasse 16 12309 Berlin / DE | 06 /
Heise, Wolfgang Alfred-Randt-Strasse 14 12559 Berlin / DE | 07 /
Braun, Peter Baseler Strasse 140 12205 Berlin / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023474.7 | 10.11.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | DE2005154173 | 14.11.2005 Original published format: DE 10554173 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1785264 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/00, B29C33/00, // B29C33/68, B29C33/76 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
B29C43/021 (EP);
B29D99/0053 (EP);
B29C69/025 (EP);
B29L2031/26 (EP);
B29L2031/7096 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen von weichelastischen Bändern | [2007/20] | English: | Apparatus and process for making an elastic band | [2007/20] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la fabrication de bandes élastiques | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1117942 (HEPWORTH IRON CO LTD) [X] 1,13 * page 2, line 46 - line 107; figure - *; | [X]DE2106889 (DAYCO CORP., DAYTON, OHIO) [X] 1-22 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]DE3139680 (FESTO MASCHF STOLL G [DE]) [A] 1,13,20* page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 2; figure - * |