EP1790415 - Small size gene analysis apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kajiyama, Tomoharu Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Off 12F. Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Kambara, Hideki Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Off 12F. Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Harada, Kunio Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Off 12F. Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2007/22] | Application number, filing date | 06023582.7 | 13.11.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | JP20050341367 | 28.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005341367 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790415 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1790415 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02, G01N35/10, C12Q1/68 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
B01L3/0241 (EP,US);
G01N35/1072 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00376 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00378 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00416 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00418 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00484 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0621 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0838 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
B01L2400/049 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/06] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kleine Vorrichtung zur Analyse von Genen | [2007/22] | English: | Small size gene analysis apparatus | [2007/22] | French: | Petit appareil pour l'analyse génétique | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10003216.8 / EP2218505 | EP11005516.7 / EP2374542 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9828440 (PYROSEQUENCING AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XD]WO0056455 (PYROSEQUENCING AB [SE], et al) [XD] 1,4,6,10-14 * page 2, line 37 - page 6, line 35 * * abstract *; | [XD]US2001024790 (KAMBARA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [XD] 1,4-6,10-13 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0030] , [0035] , [0039] , [0065] , [0077] * * abstract *; | [X]WO0177640 (ALEXION PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10 * abstract *; | [X]WO02081088 (MORPHOCHEM AG KOMB CHEMIE [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10 * abstract *; | [X]US6521187 (PAPEN ROELAND F [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract *; | [X]WO03050231 (LIU PI-YAO AILEEN [US]) [X] 8,9 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004076018 (AURORA DISCOVERY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,10-14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0016] , [0017] , [0043] , [0044] , [0051]; figures 4,5 * * abstract * |