EP1923886 - Eco disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EcoDisc Technology AG Müllerstrasse 5 8004 Zürich / CH | [2010/33] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states EcoDisc Technology AG Sonnhaldenstr. 7 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states EcoDisc Technology AG Sonnhaldenstr. 7 6052 Hergiswill / CH | ||
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states ODS Technology GmbH Werkstrasse 2-22 23942 Dassow / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nute, Roger Pezeray 49490 Chigné / FR | 02 /
Fetouhi, Al 10 Chemin des Servins 77100 Nanteuil-lès-Meaux / FR | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023768.2 | 15.11.2006 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923886 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1923886 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/00, G11B17/028 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
G11B17/028 (EP,US);
G11B23/0035 (EP,US);
G11B7/24003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | EcoDisc | [2008/21] | English: | Eco disc | [2008/21] | French: | Disque éco | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.2009 | BE | 21.10.2009 | CY | 21.10.2009 | CZ | 21.10.2009 | DK | 21.10.2009 | EE | 21.10.2009 | FI | 21.10.2009 | IT | 21.10.2009 | LT | 21.10.2009 | LV | 21.10.2009 | NL | 21.10.2009 | PL | 21.10.2009 | RO | 21.10.2009 | SE | 21.10.2009 | SI | 21.10.2009 | SK | 21.10.2009 | TR | 21.10.2009 | IE | 15.11.2009 | LU | 15.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | FR | 21.12.2009 | BG | 21.01.2010 | GR | 22.01.2010 | ES | 01.02.2010 | IS | 21.02.2010 | PT | 22.02.2010 | HU | 22.04.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
TR | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
LU | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 21.12.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 22.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
LU | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 21.12.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
HU | 22.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
LU | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 21.12.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 21.12.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 21.12.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
EE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
RO | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SK | 21.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 21.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 21.10.2009 | |
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
LT | 21.10.2009 | ||
LV | 21.10.2009 | ||
PL | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
SI | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
IS | 21.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 01.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6464163 (BROTHER IND LTD) [X] 1-9,23-31,42-44* abstract *; | [X]JPH08167272 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,4-9,23-28,31,60-63 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPH0917079 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,4-9,20-28,31,42,43 * abstract *; | [X]US5999513 (ARAKAWA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-63 * columns 1-11; figures 1-9 *; | [X]US2002075794 (PARK JUN-MIN [KR]) [X] 1,8,10-18,20-23,28,32-40,42-47,53-59 * pages 1-3; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP1291874 (WEA MFG INC [US]) [X] 1-18,20-40,42-63 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0007] , [0011] - [0013]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP1396855 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,7-11,20,22,23,25,27-30,32,33,42,44,45,48,50-53,55-59 * paragraph [0129]; figures 13,16 * |