EP1790939 - An active reactive armour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Dr.-Hell-Strasse 24107 Kiel / DE | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Töpfer, Jörg Kiefernweg 14 29614 Soltau / DE | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023797.1 | 16.11.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | DE20051056178 | 25.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005056178 | [2007/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790939 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/007 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
F41H5/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Title | German: | Aktive Reaktivpanzerung | [2007/22] | English: | An active reactive armour | [2007/22] | French: | Blindage actif et réactif | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3711635 (DEUTSCH FRANZ FORSCH INST [FR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 13; figures 2e,3; claims 1,11 * * column 6, line 11 - line 15 * * column 8, line 39 - line 68 *; | [X]FR2860065 (GIAT IND SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 15 - line 25; claims 1,3,7,8 * * page 3, line 7 - line 11 *; | [X]GB2298030 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 19 - line 29; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE19707160 | DE3515792 |