EP1790498 - Industrial production process of imitation marble objects obtained from thermoforming material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. DI SAMPAOLO FABIOLA Via Villa Berghina, 26 60025 Loreto AN / IT | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Centinari, Roberto Via Rossini, 4 60025 Loreto (AN) / IT | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | [2007/22] | Application number, filing date | 06024018.1 | 20.11.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | IT2005MC00125 | 24.11.2005 Original published format: IT MC20050125 | [2007/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790498 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B44F9/04, B32B1/02, B29C51/10, B29C51/14, B44C5/04 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
B44F9/04 (EP);
B29C51/14 (EP);
B44C5/0453 (EP);
B29C2791/001 (EP);
B29C2791/006 (EP);
B29C2795/002 (EP);
B29C51/10 (EP);
B29K2033/12 (EP);
B29L2031/7692 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/06] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von nachgeahmten Marmorobjekten aus warmgeformtem Material | [2007/22] | English: | Industrial production process of imitation marble objects obtained from thermoforming material | [2007/22] | French: | Méthode de production d'objets imitant le marbre obtenus par thermoformage | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3287193 (MAX KLEIN); | [X]US4105734 (NAKAGAWA YASUHARU); | [A]GB2329607 (AEP BORDEN PACKAGING UK LIMITE [GB]); | [A]EP1114715 (RP TOPLA LTD [JP]) |