EP1870391 - A method for obtaining 2,6-dimethylnaphthalene using isomerization and crystallization processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyosung Corporation 183, Hogye-dong Dongan-ku Anyang-si 431-080 Kyonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Hyosung Corporation 183, Hogye-dong, Dongan-ku, Anyang-si 431-080 Kyonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chenon, Yang-Ho R&D Center for Fiber &Textile 183, Hogye-dong Dongan-ku Anyang-si Kyonggi-do, 431-080 / KR | 02 /
Choi, Young-Go R&D Center for Fiber &Textile 183, Hogye-dong Dongan-ku Anyang-si Kyonggi-do, 431-080 / KR | 03 /
Kwon, Ik-Hyun R&D Center for Fiber &Textile 183, Hogye-dong Dongan-ku Anyang-si Kyonggi-do, 431-080 / KR | [2015/24] |
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
Chenon, Yang-Ho R&D Center for Fiber &Textile 183, Hogye-dong Dongan-ku Anyang-si Kyonggi-do, 431-080 / KR | ||
02 /
Choi, Young-Go R&D Center for Fiber &Textile 183, Hogye-dong Dongan-ku Anyang-si Kyonggi-do, 431-080 / KR | |||
03 /
Kwon, Ik-Hyun R&D Center for Fiber &Textile 183, Hogye-dong Dongan-ku Anyang-si Kyonggi-do, 431-080 / KR | Representative(s) | Katzameyer, Michael V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Katzameyer, Michael v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Katzameyer, Michael v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024075.1 | 20.11.2006 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | KR20060057099 | 23.06.2006 Original published format: KR 20060057099 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870391 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870391 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C7/14, C07C7/148, C07C15/24 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
C07C7/005 (EP,KR,US);
C07C7/14 (EP,KR,US);
B01D9/0004 (KR);
C07C15/24 (KR);
C07C7/148 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C7/005, C07C15/24 (EP,US);
C07C7/148, C07C15/24 (US,EP);
C07C7/14, C07C15/24 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von 2,6-Dimethylnaphthalin unter Verwendung eines Isomerisierungs- und Kristallisationsverfahrens | [2007/52] | English: | A method for obtaining 2,6-dimethylnaphthalene using isomerization and crystallization processes | [2007/52] | French: | Méthode d'obtention du 2,6-dimethylnaphthalène utilisant des procédés d'isomérisation et de cristallisation | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 05.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.10.2014 | 22.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2006 | AT | 10.06.2015 | BE | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | IE | 20.11.2015 | LU | 20.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 20.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 20.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0795529 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [YD] 5-10,12,13,17,19,20 * claims 1,2 * * page 5, line 9 - line 59 * * examples 2(cycle,1); table 3 * * examples 3(cycle,1) * * example 1; table 1 * * page 7, line 2 - line 11 *; | [XY]EP0926114 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0022] * * page 6, line 3 - line 4 * * page 8, line 19 - line 20 * * tables 1,2 * * figure 2 * [Y] 2-10,12-20; | [Y]WO9933770 (CHEVRON CHEM CO [US]) [Y] 2-4,12,14-18 * claims 1-3,5,11 * * figure 1 * * page 7, line 26 - line 31 * * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 5 * * examples 3,4 *; | [YD]EP1151981 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [YD] 12,15-19 * paragraphs [0033] , [0040] , [0041] ** paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0112] *; | [Y]EP1193237 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [Y] 19,20 * tables 5,11 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0020] , [0024] , [0025] , [0032] - [0059] * |