EP1804221 - Gaming machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Entertainment Corporation Ariake Frontier Building, Tower A 3-7-26 Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Universal Entertainment Corporation Ariake Frontier Building, Tower A, 3-7-26 Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Aruze Corp. 3-1-25, Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Kazuo Aruze Corp., 3-1-25, Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024342.5 | 23.11.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | JP20050340858 | 25.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005340858 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1804221 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
G07F17/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | Spielautomat | [2007/27] | English: | Gaming machine | [2007/27] | French: | Machine de jeu | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003070178 (BOYD ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]US2004072609 (UNGARO MARK CURRAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0011] , [0027] - [0031]; figures 1,5 * |