EP1925256 - Method and device for registering an anatomical structure with a radio opaque marker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/22] | Method and device for registering an anatomical structure with markers | ||
[2015/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brainlab AG Kapellenstrasse 12 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | [2013/47] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states BrainLAB AG Kappellenstrasse 12 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drumm, Peter Humboldtstrasse 30 81543 München / DE | 02 /
Hepke, Markus Widenmayerstrasse 24 80538 München / DE | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024421.7 | 24.11.2006 | [2008/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925256 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/12 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
A61B6/022 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/5235 (EP,US);
A61B6/5247 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
G06V10/245 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/256 (EP,US);
A61B2090/364 (EP,US);
A61B2090/376 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3762 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3916 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3954 (EP,US);
A61B6/12 (EP,US);
G06V2201/031 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Registrierung einer anatomischen Struktur mit einem radioopaken Marker | [2015/48] | English: | Method and device for registering an anatomical structure with a radio opaque marker | [2015/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à l'enregistrement d'une structure anatomique à l'aide d'un marque radio opaque | [2015/48] |
Former [2008/22] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Registrierung einer anatomischen Struktur mit Markern | ||
Former [2008/22] | Method and device for registering an anatomical structure with markers | ||
Former [2008/22] | Procédé et dispositif destinés à l'enregistrement d'une structure anatomique à l'aide de marques | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9515729 (WANG MATTEW Y [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 2 - line 14 *; | [A]WO9520343 (SCHNEIDER MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** page 4, line 21 - line 34 *; | [X]US5636255 (ELLIS RANDY E [CA]) [X] 1,7,9-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 7 *; | [X]US5799055 (PESHKIN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,4,9-12 * abstract * * column 5, line 15 - line 35 * * column 7, line 26 * * column 7, line 52 - line 53 * * column 13, line 41 - line 49 *; | [A]DE19910107 (MORITA SEISAKUSHO KYOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]US6044132 (NAVAB NASSIR [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 8 *; | [X]DE19936364 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 1, line 28 - line 32 * * column 2, line 32 - line 37 * * column 3, line 22 * * column 3, line 38 * * column 3, line 45 * * column 3, line 68 * * column 4, line 10 * * column 4, line 18 * * column 6, line 57 *; | [X]WO0134051 (MEDTRONIC SURGICAL NAVIGATION [US]) [X] 1,9-11 * abstract * * page 14, line 14 - line 24 *; | [X]US2001021806 (GUEZIEC ANDRE [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0051] , [0052] *; | [X]US2003029464 (CHEN DAVID T [US], et al) [X] 1,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0019] * | Examination | WO0187136 | US2003130576 | DE10322738 | by applicant | US5799055 | DE19936364 | US2001021806 |