EP1800585 - Coupling device particularly for fixing the seat to a toilet bowl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sipex Cavagna S.P.A. Via Tito Speri 12/C 25065 Lumezzane (Brescia) / IT | [2009/26] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Cavagna & Sipex International S.r.l. Via Faidana 6 25065 Lumezzane (Brescia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavagna, Livio Via Faidana, 6 25065 Lumezzane (Brescia) / IT | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Alagem Modiano, Lara S., et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Alagem Modiano, Lara S., et al Modiano & Associati Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06024593.3 | 28.11.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI02427 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: IT MI20052427 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800585 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1800585 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800585 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47K13/26 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A47K13/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Verbinder, insbesondere zum Verbinden eines Sitzes an einer Toilettenschüssel | [2007/26] | English: | Coupling device particularly for fixing the seat to a toilet bowl | [2007/26] | French: | Connecteur, en particulier pour relier un siège à une cuvette de toilette | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 16.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | IE | 28.11.2010 | LU | 28.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 28.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
IE | 28.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
IE | 28.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB734025 (UNITED EBONITE & LORIVAL LTD) [A] * page 2, lines 1-6; figure - *; | [XA]EP0345835 (IDEAL STANDARD SPA [IT]) [X] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,5; | [DA]EP0853916 (SIPEX S N C DI CAVAGNA LIVIO & [IT]); | [A]EP0856275 (SCHNEIDER HELMHOLD DR [DE]) [A] * figures 2-4 *; | [XA]FR2817136 (SARREGUEMINES BATIMENT [FR]) [X] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1-3 | by applicant | EP0345835 | EP0853916 | FR2817136 |