EP1927891 - Projection objective with conjugated pupils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT AG Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Epple, Alexander Langertstrasse 38 73431 Aalen / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024790.5 | 30.11.2006 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927891 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G02B17/08 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
G03F7/70341 (EP);
G02B13/22 (EP);
G02B17/08 (EP);
G02B17/0812 (EP);
G03F7/70225 (EP);
G03F7/70308 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2009/07] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Projektionsobjektiv mit konjugierten Pupillen | [2008/23] | English: | Projection objective with conjugated pupils | [2008/23] | French: | Objectif de projection avec pupilles conjuguées | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002036832 (SCHULTZ JORG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,25,27,28,30 * paragraphs [0049] , [0084] , [0085]; figure 9 *; | [X]WO2006005547 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,12-14,28,29 * pages 29-32; figure 16 *; | [X]WO2005069055 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,13,16-19,32 * pages 38-40; figures 10,11 * * page 59; figure 30 *; | [DX]WO2005111689 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1,13,15 * pages 37-39; figure 12 *; | [XY]US2005002111 (GRUNER TORALF [DE], et al) [X] 20,21,32 * paragraph [0055]; figure 1; claim 80 * [Y] 23; | [Y]US2006077371 (WEGMANN ULRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 23 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] * |