EP1773013 - Communicating method between IPv4 terminal and IPv6 terminal and IPv4-IPv6 converting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchiya, Kazuaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Naoya c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Hamamoto, Shinichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Ken 2-4-C201, Shinbokuhoncho-1-chome, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 05 /
Yasue, Toshikazu 109-18, Kagawa Chigasaki-shi / JP | 06 /
Atarashi, Yoshifumi 5816-2, Iriya-3-chome Zama-shi / JP | 07 /
Sumikawa, Munechika c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 08 /
Miyamoto, Takahisa c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 09 /
Higuchi, Hidemitsu c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2013/18] |
Former [2013/01] | 01 /
Tsuchiya, Kazuaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Ikeda, Naoya c/o Hitachi Ltd, Int.Prop.Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6220 / JP | |||
03 /
Hamamoto, Shinichi c/o Hitachi Ltd., Int.Prop.Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Yasue, Toshikazu 109-18, Kagawa Chigasaki-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Atarashi, Yoshifumi c/o Hitachi Ltd., Int.Prop.Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku 100-8220 Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Sumikawa, Munechika c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | |||
07 /
Miyamoto, Takahisa c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | |||
08 /
Higuchi, Hidemitsu c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | |||
09 /
Watanabe, Ken 2-4-C201, Shinbokuhoncho-1-chome Miyamae-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP | |||
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
Tsuchiya, Kazuaki 594-122, Yoshidacho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Ikeda, Naoya c/o Hitachi Ltd, Int.Prop.Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6220 / JP | |||
03 /
Hamamoto, Shinichi c/o Hitachi Ltd., Int.Prop.Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Yasue, Toshikazu 109-18, Kagawa Chigasaki-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Atarashi, Yoshifumi c/o Hitachi Ltd., Int.Prop.Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku 100-8220 Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Sumikawa, Munechika 24-1, Hirasawa Hagano-shi / JP | |||
07 /
Miyamoto, Takahisa 1278-106, Ogura, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | |||
08 /
Higuchi, Hidemitsu 1393-105, Yabecho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | |||
09 /
Watanabe, Ken 2-4-C201, Shinbokuhoncho-1-chome Miyamae-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP | |||
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
Tsuchiya, Kazuaki 594-122, Yoshidacho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Ikeda, Naoya 1051-F403, Kamigo Ebina-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Hamamoto, Shinichi 20-17-102, Rinkan-2-chome Yamato-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Yasue, Toshikazu 109-18, Kagawa Chigasaki-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Atarashi, Yoshifumi 5816-2, Iriya-3-chome Zama-shi / JP | |||
06 /
Sumikawa, Munechika 24-1, Hirasawa Hagano-shi / JP | |||
07 /
Miyamoto, Takahisa 1278-106, Ogura, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | |||
08 /
Higuchi, Hidemitsu 1393-105, Yabecho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | |||
09 /
Watanabe, Ken 2-4-C201, Shinbokuhoncho-1-chome Miyamae-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2013/21] |
Former [2007/15] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025235.0 | 27.10.1997 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | JP19960291480 | 01.11.1996 Original published format: JP 29148096 | JP19970212889 | 07.08.1997 Original published format: JP 21288997 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1773013 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1773013 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1773013 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66, H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/251 (EP,US);
H04L61/2567 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/167 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | H04L12/66, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/52] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kommunikationsverfahren zwischen einem IPv4-Endgerät und einem IPv6-Endgerät und IPv4-IPv6-Umwandlungsvorrichtung | [2007/15] | English: | Communicating method between IPv4 terminal and IPv6 terminal and IPv4-IPv6 converting apparatus | [2007/15] | French: | Méthode de communication entre terminaux IPv4 et terminaux IPv6 et appareil de conversion IPv4-IPv6 | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97118649.9 / EP0840482 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970118649) is 16.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - GILLIGAN & E NORDMARK R, "Transition Mechanisms for IPv6 Hosts and routers (", 19960401, (19960401), pages 1 - 22, XP002056147 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 4.1 * | [A] - ROSS CALLON DIMITRY HASKIN BAY NETWORKS INC ROUTING ASPECTS OF IPV6 TRANSITION, "Routing Aspects Of IPv6 Transition; draft-haskin-ipv6-routing-aspects 01.txt", 19950601, (19950601), no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015014117 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 3.3.4 * |