EP1921355 - Lip seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hintenlang, Günter Hardbergstrasse 33 69518 Absteinach / DE | 02 /
Heldmann, Martin Hauptstrasse 155 64678 Lindenfels / DE | 03 /
Kohl, Christian Görlitzer Strasse 8 69493 Hirschberg / DE | 04 /
Grafmüller, Martin Klingenhofstrasse 6 69488 Birkenau / DE | [2013/02] |
Former [2011/46] | 01 /
Hintenlang, Günter Hardbergstrasse 33 69518 Absteinach / DE | ||
02 /
Heldmann, Martin Hauptstrasse 155 64678 Lindenfels / DE | |||
03 /
Kohl, Christian UpUpTown III-1-Y1 -401 No 1877 Guigu Street Changchun, Jilin Province / CN | |||
04 /
Grafmüller, Martin Klingenhofstrasse 6 69488 Birkenau / DE | |||
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
Hintenlang, Günter Hardbergstrasse 33 69518 Absteinach / DE | ||
02 /
Heldmann, Martin Hauptstrasse 155 64678 Lindenfels / DE | |||
03 /
Kohl, Christian Im Langgewann 52 69469 Weinheim / DE | |||
04 /
Grafmüller, Martin Klingenhofstrasse 6 69488 Birkenau / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025283.0 | 07.12.2006 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | DE20061052348 | 07.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006052348 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1921355 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1921355 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
F16J15/322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Radialwellendichtring | [2008/20] | English: | Lip seal | [2008/20] | French: | Joint à lèvre | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2006 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | IT | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | LV | 27.02.2013 | MC | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | ES | 07.06.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 27.02.2013 | |
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 27.02.2013 | |
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4205862 (FREUDENBERG) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19705428 (TRW FAHRWERKSYST GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract *; | [X]DE4317489 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * | Examination | DE7304680U | by applicant | DE2340275 | DE10325254 |