EP1816066 - Electrical bicycle shift control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Keisuke 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 D-80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025482.8 | 08.12.2006 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | US20060346161 | 03.02.2006 Original published format: US 346161 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816066 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1816066 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/08 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
B62M25/08 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [2008/16] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrisch gesteuerte Getriebeschalteinrichtung für ein Fahrrad | [2007/32] | English: | Electrical bicycle shift control device | [2007/32] | French: | Actionneur pour transmission de bicyclette commandé électriquement | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.04.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/02] | NL | 29.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1588933 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0032] - [0058] - [0063] , [0069] , [0071]; figure - *; | [X]EP1473220 (CAMPAGNOLO SRL [IT]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]EP1535830 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | US6073730 | US6129580 | US2005223840 | EP1588922 |