EP1803369 - Solid paste dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOMBOW PENCIL CO., LTD. 6-10-12, Toshima, Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8583 / JP | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakoshi, Yasuo 3-18-12, Mukohyama Ageo-shi, Saitama, 362-0045 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Hideo 1-11-25-402, Honcho Shiki-shi, Saitama, 353-0004 / JP | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Horst Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Schmidt, Horst Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/27] | Schmidt, Horst Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 44 01 20 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025711.0 | 12.12.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | JP20050376183 | 27.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005376183 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803369 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1803369 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/04 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
A45D40/04 (EP,US);
B43M11/00 (KR);
A45D40/16 (EP,US);
A45D2040/0043 (EP,US);
A45D2040/0062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | Pastenspender | [2007/27] | English: | Solid paste dispenser | [2007/27] | French: | Distributeur pour produit pâteux solide | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/02] | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3232275 (ZIEGLER LOUIS C, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 41 *; | [X]DE4116581 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 7, line 27 - column 9, line 14; figures 5-7 *; | [A]EP0922406 (KOTOBUKI & CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0026] *; | [A]JP3050548B (SUZUNO KASEI KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]FR2833816 (LIR FRANCE SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 24; figures 3a-3c *; | [A]WO2004049857 (TOKIWA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |