EP1763019 - Orthogonalization search for the CELP based speech coding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 1-11 Kanda-Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2014/09] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasunaga, Kazutoshi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC Matsushita IMP Bldg. 19. fl. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
Morii, Toshiyuki Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Matsushita IMP Bldg. 19. fl. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2016/49] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
Yasunaga, Kazutoshi Matsushita Elect.Ind. Co., Ltd. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | ||
02 /
Morii, Toshiyuki Matsushita Elect. Ind. Co., Ltd. 1-3-7, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2007/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025737.5 | 22.10.1998 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | JP19970289412 | 22.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28941297 | JP19970295130 | 28.10.1997 Original published format: JP 29513097 | JP19980085717 | 31.03.1998 Original published format: JP 8571798 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763019 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763019 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/12, // G10L19/10 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
G10L19/10 (EP,US);
G10L19/12 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/107 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | G10L19/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/49] |
Former [2007/11] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Orthogonalisierungssuche für die CELP basierte Sprachkodierung | [2007/11] | English: | Orthogonalization search for the CELP based speech coding | [2007/11] | French: | Recherche par orthogonalisation pour le codage de parole de type CELP | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98950336.2 / EP0967594 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980950336) is 27.04.2005 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 09.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 17   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.12.2016 | [2017/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IKEDO J ET AL, "Low complexity speech coder for personal multimedia communication", 1995 FOURTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS RECORD. GATEWAY TO THE 21ST. CENTURY. TOKYO, NOV. 6 - 10, 1995, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19951106), vol. CONF. 4, ISBN 0-7803-2955-4, pages 808 - 812, XP010160652 [A] 1-3 * paragraph [III.B] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICUPC.1995.497121 | [A] - KATAOKA A ET AL, "AN 8-KB/S CONJUGATE STRUCTURE CELP (CS-CELP) SPEECH CODER", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199611), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1063-6676, pages 401 - 411, XP000785317 [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0V.C] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/89.544525 |