EP1808818 - Method for transmitting information and signal transmission system, in particular for access control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATMEL Germany GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Harald Brunnenstrasse 15 56338 Braubach/Rhein / DE | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Müller, Wolf-Christian Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maassstrasse 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [2009/26] |
Former [2008/12] | Müller, Wolf-Christian Maassstrasse 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025923.1 | 14.12.2006 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | DE20051060914 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005060914 | [2007/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808818 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00777 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00793 (EP,US);
G07C2209/63 (EP,US);
G07C9/00714 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/13] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Übertragen von Informationen und Signalübertragungssystem, insbesondere zur Zugangskontrolle | [2007/29] | English: | Method for transmitting information and signal transmission system, in particular for access control | [2007/29] | French: | Procédé destiné à la transmission d'informations et système de transmission du signal, en particulier destiné au contrôle d'accès | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 18.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0034799 (U S WIRELESS CORP [US], et al) [A] 6-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 5 *; | [DX]DE10046897 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DX] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0038] * * claims 1-11 *; | [A]WO03034349 (MICROCHIP TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** figures 1-6 *; | [DX]EP1318483 (ATMEL GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0018] * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US6937136 (GREENWOOD JEREMY JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,10-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 9 * * column 1, line 50 - column 7, line 5 * * figures 1-7 * * claims 1-21 * [A] 8,9; | [X]EP1588909 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-8 * |