EP1821532 - Image display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moon, Hyoung Gun No. 163-8 Samdukdong-3ga Joong-ku Daegu-si 700-413 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Deok Soo No. 104-1604 Mirae Jugong Apt. Jinpyung-dong Gumi-si Kyungsangbuk-do 730-360 / KR | 03 /
Kong, Jun Hee No. 604-1306 Buyoung Apt. Gupyung-dong Gumi-si Kyungsangbuk-do 730-789 / KR | 04 /
Hwang, Tae Hwa No. Na-210 LG Electronics Dormitory 265-20, Gongdan2-dong Gumi-si Kyungsangbuk-do 730-032 / KR | 05 /
Keum, Jong Yoon No. 16/5, 317-53 Dangri-dong Saha-ku Busan-si, 604-010 / KR | 06 /
Lim, Geun Soo No. 205-402 Chungsol village 180 Geumgok-dong Bundang-ku Sungnam-si Kyunggi-do 463-720 / KR | 07 /
Song, Yong No. 207-601 Buyoung Apt. 429 Gupyung-dong Gumi-si Kyungsangbuk-do 730-789 / KR | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025968.6 | 14.12.2006 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | KR20060016297 | 20.02.2006 Original published format: KR 20060016297 | KR20060017562 | 23.02.2006 Original published format: KR 20060017562 | KR20060021831 | 08.03.2006 Original published format: KR 20060021831 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1821532 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/64, H05K7/20, H01J17/28, G06F1/16 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
H04N5/64 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F1/1656 (EP,US);
G06F1/184 (EP,US);
G06F1/185 (EP,US);
G06F1/186 (EP,US);
H05K7/142 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/18] |
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildanzeigevorrichtung | [2007/34] | English: | Image display apparatus | [2007/34] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'image | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2002067591 (TAJIMA HISAO [JP]) [X] 1,6,13,14,16-18 * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0134] * * figures 9a,9b,16a,16b * [A] 4,5,7,8,15,19; | [XA]EP1378926 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 3a,3b,4-7 * [A] 3-5,7,9,13,16,18-20; | [A]US2005117304 (KIM KI-JUNG [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0910107 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 4,6,8 *; | [A]EP1494467 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 2,3 * |