EP1936494 - Method for runtime execution of one or more tasks defined in a workflow process language [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Software AG Uhlandstrasse 12 64297 Darmstadt / DE | For all designated states Metaware Societá per Azioni Via Turati 43-45 56125 Pisa / IT | [2008/46] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Metaware Societá per Azioni Via Turati 43-45 56125 Pisa / IT | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states SOFTWARE AG Uhlandstrasse 12 64297 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tommasi, Alessandro Via Paolina Bonaparte 133 55049 Viareggio (LU) / IT | 02 /
Zavattari, Cesare Via del Santo 103 55020 Diecimo (LU) / IT | 03 /
Fröhlich, Andreas Am Trockenbusch 8 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Gesmann, Michael Bellenweg 3 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
Schöning, Dr. Harald Theobaldstr. 36 64807 Dieburg / DE | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
Tommasi, Alessandro Via Paolina Bonaparte 133 55049 Viareggio (LU) / IT | ||
02 /
Zavattari, Cesare Via del Santo 103 55020 Diecimo (LU) / IT | |||
03 /
Fröhlich, Andreas Am Trockenbusch 3 64297 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
Gesmann, Michael Bellenweg 3 64297 Darmstadt / DE | |||
05 /
Schöning, Dr. Harald Theobaldstr. 36 64807 Dieburg / DE | |||
Former [2008/26] | 01 /
Tommasi, Alessandro Via Paolina Bonaparte 133 55049 Viareggio (LU) / IT | ||
02 /
Zavattari, Cesare Via del Santo 103 55020 Diecimo (LU) / IT | |||
03 /
Fröhlich, Andreas Am Trockenbusch 3 64297 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
Gesmann, Michael Bellenweg 3 64297 Darmstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06026538.6 | 21.12.2006 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1936494 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1936494 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06Q10/00 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
G06F8/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ausführung von in einer Prozessbeschreibungssprache definierten Aufgaben | [2008/26] | English: | Method for runtime execution of one or more tasks defined in a workflow process language | [2008/26] | French: | Procédé d'exécution des tâches définies dans un langage de processus | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2011 | BE | 03.08.2011 | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HU | 03.08.2011 | IT | 03.08.2011 | LT | 03.08.2011 | LV | 03.08.2011 | NL | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | TR | 03.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | ES | 14.11.2011 | IS | 03.12.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | IE | 21.12.2011 | LU | 21.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 03.08.2011 | |
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004162741 (FLAXER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1643431 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X] - CHUNG P W H ET AL, "Knowledge-based process management-an approach to handling adaptive workflow", Knowledge-Based Systems Elsevier UK, vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0950-7051, (200304), pages 149 - 160, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0950-7051(02)00080-1, (20070529), XP002435458 [X] 1-12 * sections 4 and 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0950-7051(02)00080-1 | [X] - VIEIRA T A S C ET AL, "An ontology-driven architecture for flexible workflow execution", WEBMEDIA AND LA-WEB, 2004. PROCEEDINGS RIBEIRAO PRETO-SP, BRAZIL 12-15 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041012), ISBN 0-7695-2237-8, pages 70 - 77, XP010734861 [X] 1-12 * sections 3 - 6 * | [A] - BECO S ET AL, "OWL-WS: A Workflow Ontology for Dynamic Grid Service Composition", E-SCIENCE AND GRID COMPUTING, FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PITTSBURG, PA, USA 05-08 DEC. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051205), ISBN 0-7695-2448-6, pages 148 - 155, XP010874733 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/E-SCIENCE.2005.64 | by applicant | US2004162741 | EP1643431 | - P.W.H. CHUNG ET AL., "Knowledge-based process management - an approach to handling adaptive worliflow", KNOWLEDGE-BASED SYSTEMS ELSEVIER UK, (200304), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 149 - 160 | - T. VIEIRA ET AL., "An ontology-driven architecture for flexible workflow execution", WEBMEDIA AND LA-WEB 2004, PROCEEDINGS, (20041012), pages 70 - 77 | - S. BECO ET AL., "OWL-WS: A Workflow Ontology for Dynamic Grid Service Composition", E-SCIENCE AND GRID COMPUTING, FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (20051205), pages 148 - 155 |