EP1661714 - Non-contact communication between device and cartridge containing consumable component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosugi, Yasuhiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 06075123.7 | 27.11.2002 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | JP20010362745 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001362745 | JP20010362746 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001362746 | JP20020164740 | 05.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002164740 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1661714 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B41J2/17546 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (KR);
B41J2/17503 (EP,US);
B41J29/393 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | Drahtlose Verbindung zwischen einem Gerät und einer Tintenpatrone | [2006/22] | English: | Non-contact communication between device and cartridge containing consumable component | [2006/22] | French: | Communication sans contact entre un dispositif et une cartouche contenant un composant consommable | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02258171.4 / EP1316428 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2744391 (IMAJE SA [FR]) [A] 1-6 * page 7, column 18 - page 10, column 16; figure . *; | [A]WO9804414 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 28; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1060895 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0045]; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2354735 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 7, line 9 - page 9, line 17 *; | [A]EP1088668 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039]; figure 9 *; | [A]DE19954749 (TALLY COMPUTERDRUCKER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 3 - line 56; figure 2 * |