EP1648105 - Synchronisation in digital communications networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quayle, John Alan 2 Wismore Close Ipswich, Suffolk IP2 9SW / GB | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Galik, Peter Maximilian Liebigstraße 20b 80538 München / DE | [2012/21] |
Former [2011/23] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/16] | Lloyd, Barry George William BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06075133.6 | 27.06.1996 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | EP19950304531 | 27.06.1995 Original published format: EP 95304531 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1648105 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1648105 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
H04J3/0682 (EP,US);
H04L7/08 (KR);
H04J3/1694 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2006/16] | Title | German: | Synchronisierung in digitalen Kommunikationsnetzwerken | [2006/16] | English: | Synchronisation in digital communications networks | [2006/16] | French: | Synchronisation dans des réseaux de communication numériques | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96921003.8 / EP0835566 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960921003) is 02.09.2003 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.05.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 01.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0585087 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 20 - line 40 * * column 2, line 15 - line 49 *; | [A]EP0616444 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, lines 1-11 * * page 4, columns 3-11 * * page 4, line 55 - page 6, line 41 * * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 25 *; | [A]EP0616443 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, lines 1-12 * * page 2, line 56 - page 4, line 19 * * page 4, line 33 - page 8, line 41 *; | [A] - OKUMURA Y ET AL, "DUPLEX SYSTEM CONFIGURATION IN PASSIVE DOUBLE STAR SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM). SAN FRANCISCO, NOV. 28 - DEC. 2, 1994, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19941128), VOL. 3, ISBN 0-7803-1821-8, pages 1930 - 1934, XP000488856 [A] 1,2,4-7,9 * page 1930, column R, line 2 - line 10 * * page 1933, column L, line 7 - page 1934, column L, line 37 * |