EP1659361 - Electric primer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.A. Brands, L.L.C. 870 Remington Drive Madison North Carolina 27025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states R.A. Brands, L.L.C. 870 Remington Drive Madison North Carolina 27025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, Todd D. 1507 Yates Chapel Road Cecilia Kentucky 42724 / US | 02 /
Danner, Dale R. P.O. Box 151 Eastview, Kentucky 42732 / US | 03 /
Dwyer, John M. Jr. 5410 Meadow Stream way Crestwood, Kentucky 40014 / US | 04 /
Lopata, Frances G. 13000 River Crest Drive Littlerock, Arkansas 72212 / US | 05 /
Ronkainen, Diane 571 Old Sonora Road Hodgenville, Kentucky 42748 / US | 06 /
Schluckebier, David K. 110 Connecticut Street Elizabethtown, Kentucky 42701 / US | 07 /
Shanks, Robert B. 1000E. Connie Lane Oak Creek, Wisconsin 53154 / US | 08 /
Stone, Jeffrey W. 812 Sunrise Lane Elizabethtown, Kentucky 42701 / US | 09 /
Wildman, Spencer D. 6909 Bridgepointe Boulevard Prospect, Kentucky 40059 / US | 10 /
Wolterman, David S. 891 Overall Phillips Road Elizabethtown, Kentucky 42701 / US | [2006/48] |
Former [2006/21] | 01 /
Cook, Todd D. 2505 Flaherty road Ekron, Kentucky 40117 / US | ||
02 /
Danner, Dale R. P.O. Box 2324 Elisabethtown, Kentucky 42702 / US | |||
03 /
Dwyer, John M. Jr. 5410 Meadow Stream way Crestwood, Kentucky 40014 / US | |||
04 /
Lopata, Frances G. 13000 River Crest Drive Littlerock, Arkansas 72212 / US | |||
05 /
Ronkainen, Diane 571 Old Sonora Road Hodgenville, Kentucky 42748 / US | |||
06 /
Schluckebier, David K. 110 Connecticut Street Elizabethtown, Kentucky 42701 / US | |||
07 /
Shanks, Robert B. 1000E. Connie Lane Oak Creek, Wisconsin 53154 / US | |||
08 /
Stone, Jeffrey W. 239 Oakwood Elizabethtown, Kentucky 42701 / US | |||
09 /
Wildman, Spencer D. Bridgepoint Boulevard Prospect, Kentucky / US | |||
10 /
Wolterman, David S. 891 Overall Phillips Road Elizabethtown, Kentucky 42701 / US | Representative(s) | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/21] | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06075359.7 | 10.12.1998 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | US19970988898 | 11.12.1997 Original published format: US 988898 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1659361 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1659361 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F42C19/12 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
F42B3/18 (EP,US);
F42C19/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT [2006/21] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Zündmittel | [2006/21] | English: | Electric primer | [2006/21] | French: | Amorce électrique | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98965988.3 / EP1036298 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR504020 (HELMUTH PAUL MARTIN [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 44 - page 3, column R, line 58; figures 4,5 *; | [XY]DE1006314 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [X] 1-7,9 * column 1, line 1 - line 24 * * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 18; figures 1-3; examples 1-3 * [Y] 8,10; | [XAY]US3455244 (BALLREICH KURT, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 35 - line 40 * * column 2, line 69 - column 3, line 39; figures 3,4 * [A] 2-7 [Y] 8,10; | [A]DE2659550 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [A] 1 * page 8, line 7 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]US4605453 (SPEAR ROBERT J [AU], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 15 - line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5044278 (CAMPBELL W D [US]) | by applicant | US5646367 |