EP1670234 - Wireless LAN with load balancing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Awater, Geert Arnout Albrecht Thaerlaan 66 3571 PX Utrecht / NL | 02 /
Kamerman, Adriaan Poseidonburg 9 3437 HP Nieuwegein / NL | 03 /
Moelard, Hendrik Pauwenkamp 250 3607 GT Maarssen / NL | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 06075524.6 | 19.05.2000 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1670234 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1670234 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
H04W36/22 (EP,US);
H04W36/304 (EP);
H04W36/30 (US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/24] | Title | German: | Drahtloses, lokales Netzwerk mit Lastverteilung | [2006/35] | English: | Wireless LAN with load balancing | [2006/24] | French: | Réseau local sans fil avec équilibrage de charge | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/24] | Drahtloses lokales Netzwerk mit Lastverteilung | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00304239.7 / EP1156623 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5815811 (PINARD PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,13-15,18,22,23,28,30-33,35,37 * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 38; figures 2a,2b,3 * * column 4, line 66 - column 6, line 13 * [A] 2,5-7,9-12,16,17,19-21,24-27,29,34,36; | [X] - CHI-CHUN LO ET AL, "QoS provisioning in handoff algorithms for wireless LAN", BROADBAND COMMUNICATIONS, 1998. ACCESSING, TRANSMISSION, NETWORKING. PROCEEDINGS. 1998 INTERNATIONAL ZURICH SEMINAR ON ZURICH, SWITZERLAND 17-19 FEB. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980217), ISBN 0-7803-3893-6, pages 9 - 16, XP010277013 [X] 1,3,8,13,14,18,22,23,28,30-33,35,37 * page 11, column L, line 14 - page 12, column L, line 26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IZSBC.1998.670238 |