EP1681373 - Composition for increasing the adhesion of polymeric materials to metal surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MacDermid, Incorporated 245 Freight Street Waterbury, CT 06702 / US | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrier, Donald 455 Prospect street Thomaston, CT 06787 / US | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 06075567.5 | 01.05.2001 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | US20000590046 | 08.06.2000 Original published format: US 590046 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681373 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1681373 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/40, C23C22/52, C23F1/18, H05K3/38 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
H05K3/383 (EP,US);
C23C22/40 (EP,US);
C23C22/52 (EP,US);
C23F1/18 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0796 (EP,US);
H05K2203/122 (EP,US);
H05K2203/124 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/29] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Verbesserung der Haftfähigkeit von Polymeren an der Metalloberflächen | [2006/29] | English: | Composition for increasing the adhesion of polymeric materials to metal surfaces | [2006/29] | French: | Composition pour augmenter l'adhérence des polymères sur des surfaces métalliques | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01932816.0 / EP1289678 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0403241 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,10,11 * page 2, line 35 - page 5, line 15 * [Y] 1-4,7-11; | [Y]US6036758 (FAIRWEATHER WILLIAM A [GB]) [Y] 1-4,7-11 * column 2, lines 10-15,51-53,58-65 * * column 3, lines 6-31 * * examples 1-5; claims 1,2,9-21 *; | [Y]US5550006 (LARSON GARY B [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 44 - column 9, line 50 * * examples I-II *; | [Y]US4264378 (OPPEN DIETER, et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 6, line 10 *; | [Y]EP0926265 (ROHCO INC MCGEAN [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [PY]US6162503 (FERRIER DONALD [US]) [PY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [PY]US6146701 (FERRIER DONALD [US]) [PY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1394288 (NIHON HYOMEN KAGAKU KABUSHIKI [JP]) [E] 1,2,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0984672 (MACDERMID INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6020029 (FERRIER DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |