EP1736186 - Apparatus and method for separating at least two discrete volumes of composite liquid into at least two components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo BCT, Inc. 10811 West Collins Avenue Lakewood, CO 80215 / US | [2012/26] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states CaridianBCT, Inc. 10811 West Collins Avenue Lakewood, CO 80215 / US | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Gambro BCT, Inc. 10811 West Collins Avenue Lakewood, CO 80215 / US | ||
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Gambro, Inc. 10810 West Collins Avenue Lakewood Colorado 80215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hudock, Darryl 2194 Cactus Bluff Avenue Highlands Ranch, Colorado 80219 / US | 02 /
Joseph, Daniel A. 617 Iowa Street Golden, Colorado 80403 / US | 03 /
Dolecek, Victor D. 6607 South Atchinson way Englewood, Colorado 80111 / US | 04 /
Hlavinka, Dennis J. 7365 North Salvia Court Arvada, Colorado 80007 / US | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Mark Peter, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2015/38] |
Former [2009/50] | Roberts, Mark Peter, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/07] | Roberts, Mark Peter, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/52] | Lejeune, Daniel Gambro Patent Department 61, avenue Tony Garnier 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 06076187.1 | 07.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | US20050693320P | 22.06.2005 Original published format: US 693320 P | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736186 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1736186 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B04B9/14, B04B13/00, A61M1/36, B04B5/04 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
A61M1/0218 (EP,US);
A61M1/3696 (EP,US);
A61M1/3698 (EP,US);
B04B5/0428 (EP,US);
B04B9/14 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0429 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0439 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3365 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | A61M1/36, B04B5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Trennen wenigstens zweier verschiedener Volumina einer zusammengesetzten Flüssigkeit in wenigstens zwei Komponenten | [2006/52] | English: | Apparatus and method for separating at least two discrete volumes of composite liquid into at least two components | [2006/52] | French: | Appareil et méthode de séparation d'au moins deux volumes de liquide composite en au mois deux constituants. | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 25.06.2009 | [2009/36] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2006 | AT | 16.09.2015 | BE | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | IE | 07.06.2016 | LU | 07.06.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.06.2006 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.06.2006 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5715731 (KOCH MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 5,13,31 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 6 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 30 *; | [A]WO0054823 (TRANSFUSION TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 3,4,20-22* page 5, lines 26-29 *; | [Y]US2002082153 (JORGENSEN GLEN [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]US2003194104 (IRBY STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 49,53,54 * paragraphs [0036] , [0038] , [0040] , [0042] , [0048] , [0053] *; | [YA]WO03089027 (GAMBRO INC [US]) [Y] 7,15 * page 17 * * page 27 * [A] 49-52,55-60; | [XY]US6652475 (SAHINES THOMAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,20-26,28,30 * figures 2,10,11 * * column 2, lines 20-36 * * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 31 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 41 * * column 5, line 16 * [Y] 5,7,11-13,15,31 |