EP1739344 - Night vision infrared illuminator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harter, Joseph E., Jr. 4208 Michael Drive Kokomo, IN 46902 / US | 02 /
Scharenbroch, Gregory K. 1726 Tall Oaks Drive Kokomo, IN 46901 / US | 03 /
Rege, Siddharth S. 2413 Hazelnut Lane Kokomo, IN 46902 / US | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/01] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06076217.6 | 13.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | US20050171069 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 171069 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739344 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1739344 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, F21S8/10 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
F21V9/04 (EP,US);
F21S41/13 (EP,US);
F21S41/162 (EP,US);
F21S41/321 (EP,US);
F21S41/365 (EP,US);
F21V7/28 (EP,US);
F21V7/0008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Title | German: | Nachtsicht-Infrarot-Licht | [2007/01] | English: | Night vision infrared illuminator | [2007/01] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage infrarouge pour vision nocturne | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | BE | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | LT | 25.02.2009 | LV | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | PL | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | IE | 13.06.2009 | LU | 13.06.2009 | IS | 25.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
LU | 13.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
LU | 13.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 13.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000235803 ; | [A]JPH09288908 ; | [YA]US5977694 (MCGUIRE KEVIN P [US]) [Y] 9,17 * column 3, line 51 - line 62 * * column 4, line 13 - line 31 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,11; | [A]EP1258674 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,9-11,13,14,17,18 * column 2, line 35 - line 57 * * column 4, line 25 - line 35 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 2,3 *; | [YA]US6650058 (WANG CALVIN [US]) [Y] 8 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 4 * * figure 1 * [A] 1 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000235803 A 20000829 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [X] 1-7,10-16,18-21 * abstract * [Y] 8,9,17 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09288908 A 19971104 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,2,4-6,9-11,13-15,17,19,20 * abstract * |