EP1764605 - Cone penetrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERENIGDE BEDRIJVEN VAN DEN BERG HEERENVEEN HOLDING B.V. 4, Ijzerweg NL-8445 PK Heerenveen / NL | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veenstra, Ruurd 130, Weidemaad 8431 TW Oosterwolde fr / NL | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/44] |
Former [2007/12] | Houben, Christiaan Hein Willem Frans Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 06076430.5 | 17.07.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | NL20051029595 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: NL 1029595 | [2007/12] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764605 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764605 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764605 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/42, G01N33/24, E02D1/02, G01N3/40 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
G01N3/40 (EP);
E02D1/022 (EP);
G01N2203/0082 (EP);
G01N33/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/12] | G01N3/42, G01N33/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kegelpenetrometer | [2007/12] | English: | Cone penetrometer | [2007/12] | French: | Pénétromètre conique | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 18.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 12.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2006 | AT | 22.09.2021 | CY | 22.09.2021 | CZ | 22.09.2021 | DK | 22.09.2021 | EE | 22.09.2021 | ES | 22.09.2021 | FI | 22.09.2021 | LT | 22.09.2021 | LV | 22.09.2021 | MC | 22.09.2021 | PL | 22.09.2021 | RO | 22.09.2021 | SI | 22.09.2021 | SK | 22.09.2021 | TR | 22.09.2021 | BG | 22.12.2021 | GR | 23.12.2021 | IS | 22.01.2022 | PT | 24.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.07.2006 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.07.2006 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4382384 (MITCHELL JAMES K, et al) [Y] 9 * column 1, line 39 - line 51 ** column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 16 *; | [IY]US4398414 (MACGREGOR JOHN S [AU]) [I] 1-8,10-13 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 30; figures 1,4 * [Y] 9; | [IA]US4554819 (ALI MUHAMMAD A [US]) [I] 1-8,10-13 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 46; figure 2C * [A] 9; | [IA]US2004118199 (FROST JAMES DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-8,10-13 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055]; figure 3 * [A] 9; | [IA]WO2005003728 (SOIL AND TOPOGRAPHY INFORMATIO [US], et al) [I] 1-8,10-13 * page 8, line 1 - line 10; figure 3 * [A] 9 | by applicant | EP0010988 | NL1012468C |