EP1746320 - Fluid trim apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPX Corporation 13515 Ballantyne Corporate Place Charlotte, NC 28277 / US | [2009/49] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states SPX CORPORATION 13515 Ballantyne Corporate Place Charlotte, NC 28277 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shea, Allan K. 4345 Holiday Drive Erie, PA 16506 / US | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Vermeulen, Martijn Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Vermeulen, Martijn Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 06076445.3 | 18.07.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | US20050183898 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 183898 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746320 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1746320 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16K47/08 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
F16K47/08 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86734 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86791 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | Käfigeinrichtung für Fluid und Verfahren | [2007/04] | English: | Fluid trim apparatus and method | [2007/04] | French: | Dispositif de cage pour fluide et procédé | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.2009 | BE | 02.12.2009 | CY | 02.12.2009 | CZ | 02.12.2009 | DK | 02.12.2009 | EE | 02.12.2009 | FI | 02.12.2009 | IT | 02.12.2009 | LT | 02.12.2009 | LV | 02.12.2009 | PL | 02.12.2009 | RO | 02.12.2009 | SE | 02.12.2009 | SI | 02.12.2009 | SK | 02.12.2009 | BG | 02.03.2010 | GR | 03.03.2010 | ES | 13.03.2010 | IS | 02.04.2010 | PT | 02.04.2010 | HU | 03.06.2010 | IE | 18.07.2010 | LU | 18.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
IE | 18.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
IE | 18.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
IT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3690344 (BRUMM RICHARD S) [X] 1,2,9,17,18* column 4, line 20 - line 30; figure 5 *; | [XY]US4429714 (HUGHES ALLAN B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,17-19 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 2; figure - * [Y] 4,5,12,13; | [XA]JPH03194273 (KIMITSU KIKO KK) [X] 1,2,9,10,14,15,17,18 * the whole document * [A] 6,7,20; | [X]JPH08247336 (MOTOYAMA ENG WORKS) [X] 6-8,14-16,20-22 * the whole document *; | [YA]WO0009923 (KENT INTROL LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 4,5,12,13 * page 2 - page 4; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-3,9-11,17-19 | by applicant | US4429714 | WO0009923 |