EP1772627 - A sealing system for a compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, James A. 53 Arlington Road Apt. No. 1 Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | 02 /
Wolfe IV, Edward 51 Schoelles Amherst, NY 14228 / US | 03 /
Kumpf, William J. 295 Continental Drive Lockport, NY 14094 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
Baker, James A. 53 Arlington Road Apt. No. 1 Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | ||
02 /
Wolfe IV, E. 51 Schoelles Amherst, NY 14228 / US | |||
03 /
Kumpf, William J. 295 Continental Drive Lockport, NY 14094 / US | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, BP 60059, Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06076782.9 | 27.09.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | US20050244797 | 06.10.2005 Original published format: US 244797 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772627 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1772627 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/10 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
F04B27/109 (EP,US);
F04B27/1036 (EP,US);
F04B27/1063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Title | German: | Dichtungssystem für Verdichter | [2007/15] | English: | A sealing system for a compressor | [2007/15] | French: | Système d'étanchéité pour compresseur | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2008 | BE | 24.09.2008 | CY | 24.09.2008 | CZ | 24.09.2008 | DK | 24.09.2008 | EE | 24.09.2008 | FI | 24.09.2008 | IT | 24.09.2008 | LT | 24.09.2008 | LV | 24.09.2008 | NL | 24.09.2008 | PL | 24.09.2008 | RO | 24.09.2008 | SI | 24.09.2008 | SK | 24.09.2008 | TR | 24.09.2008 | IE | 27.09.2008 | LU | 27.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | BG | 24.12.2008 | SE | 24.12.2008 | GR | 25.12.2008 | ES | 04.01.2009 | IS | 24.01.2009 | PT | 24.02.2009 | HU | 25.03.2009 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/41] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CY | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
TR | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 27.09.2008 | ||
LU | 27.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 27.09.2008 | ||
LU | 27.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 27.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 27.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 27.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
LV | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 24.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2835436 (STEINHAGEN WILLIAM K, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0426206 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE19706066 (UNGER HANS DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-17 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0990795 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [AD] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] , [0055] * |