EP1772358 - Trailer which can be coupled behind a passenger car, method for manufacturing or adapting such trailer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/15] | Trailer which can be coupled behind a passenger car, method for manufacturing or adapting such trailer, and kit for converting a trailer | ||
[2008/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holtkamp, Egbert Berend Hoofdkade 92 A 9561 JK Ter Apel / NL | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/15] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06076844.7 | 05.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | NL20051030120 | 05.10.2005 Original published format: NL 1030120 | [2007/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772358 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772358 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1772358 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D63/06, B60D1/14 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
B60D1/485 (EP);
B60D1/06 (EP);
B60D1/481 (EP);
B62D63/06 (EP);
B60D2001/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | RS | 13.12.2007 | Title | German: | Anhänger für einen Personenkraftwagen, Verfahren zur Fabrikation oder Adaptation eines derartigen Anhängers | [2008/49] | English: | Trailer which can be coupled behind a passenger car, method for manufacturing or adapting such trailer | [2008/49] | French: | Remorque attachable derrière une voiture, méthode pour la fabrication ou l'adaptation d'une pareille remorque | [2008/49] |
Former [2007/15] | Anhänger für einen Personenkraftwagen, Verfahren zur Fabrikation oder Adaptation eines derartigen Anhängers und Umbausatz für einen Anhänger | ||
Former [2007/15] | Trailer which can be coupled behind a passenger car, method for manufacturing or adapting such trailer, and kit for converting a trailer | ||
Former [2007/15] | Remorque attachable derrière une voiture, méthode pour la fabrication ou l'adaptation d'une pareille remorque, et kit de conversion d'une remorque | Examination procedure | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.06.2009 | CZ | 17.06.2009 | EE | 17.06.2009 | FI | 17.06.2009 | LT | 17.06.2009 | LV | 17.06.2009 | PL | 17.06.2009 | RO | 17.06.2009 | SI | 17.06.2009 | SK | 17.06.2009 | TR | 17.06.2009 | BG | 17.09.2009 | GR | 18.09.2009 | ES | 28.09.2009 | IE | 05.10.2009 | LU | 05.10.2009 | IS | 17.10.2009 | PT | 17.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | HU | 18.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IE | 05.10.2009 | ||
LU | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IE | 05.10.2009 | ||
LU | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IE | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | FI | 17.06.2009 | |
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5069471 (VAN DER LINDEN JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * figures 1,4,6 * * column 3, line 4 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, line 45 - column 3, line 61 *; | [X]US5387002 (GREVICH JOHN J [US]) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1,3,5 * * column 8, line 51 - column 8, line 65 *; | [A]NL1009633C (TOBO BV [NL]) [A] 1-4,7-11 * figure 1 ** page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 9 *; | [A]EP1008468 (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,7,8,10,11 * figure 1 * * column 6, paragraph 41 * | by applicant | US5069471 | US5387002 | NL1009633C |