EP1783336 - Vehicle exhaust after treatment system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goulette, David Alexander 7205 Shea Road Marine City MI 48039 / US | 02 /
Bonadies, Joseph V. 115 Fabris Lane Clarkston MI 48348 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/19] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06076922.1 | 25.10.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | US20050268304 | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 268304 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783336 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F01N3/025, F01N3/033 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
F01N3/025 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0093 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N3/2006 (EP,US);
F01N2240/30 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Abgasnachbehandlungssystem eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [2007/19] | English: | Vehicle exhaust after treatment system | [2007/19] | French: | Système de traitement des gaz d'échappement d'un véhicule | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5746989 (MURACHI MIKIO [JP], et al) [A] 3,5* column 3, lines 35-42 *; | [Y]WO0218753 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 11 * column 1, lines 18-23; figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2004030798 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 5-7 * * page 8, lines 4-9; figure 1 * [Y] 3,5,7,10,11; | [Y]US2004112046 (TUMATI PRASAD [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,7,10 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028]; figure 2 * |