EP1802189 - Arrangement for placing a frequency converter in a cabinet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vacon Oy Runsorintie 7 65380 Vaasa / FI | [2016/03] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Vacon Oyj Runsorintie 7 65380 Vaasa / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pesonen, Sami Länsitie 574 66450 Jakkula / FI | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Äyritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Järveläinen, Pertti Tauno Juhani, et al Heinänen Oy Annankatu 31-33 C 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06077260.5 | 15.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | FI20050001307 | 21.12.2005 Original published format: FI 20051307 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1802189 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1802189 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, H05K7/20, // H02M7/00 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H05K5/0021 (FI);
H02M5/00 (FI);
H05K7/1432 (US);
H05K7/14325 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | H05K7/14, H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | [2016/43] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Platzierung eines Frequenzumformers in einem Gehäuse | [2007/26] | English: | Arrangement for placing a frequency converter in a cabinet | [2007/26] | French: | Agencement pour le placement d'un convertisseur de fréquence dans un boîtier | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9313587 (SIEMENS ELECTRIC LTD [CA]) [A] 1,7* figure 1 *; | [X]JPH0847268 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [X] 1,7 * figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US5969965 (BYRNE VINCENT M [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * figure 3 * [I] 2-6,8; | [X]WO03050938 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1,7 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004082348 (BAUMUELLER ANLAGEN SYSTEMTECH [DE], et al) [X] 1,7 * figure 3 * |