EP1867648 - Substituted aminopyrazolopyridines and salts thereof, their preparations and pharmaceutical compositions comprising them. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartung, Ingo Wittenauerstrasse 127 13469 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Ince, Stuart Stephanstr. 52 10559 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kettschau, Georg Mendelstr. 41 13187 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Thierauch, Karl-Heinz Hochwildpfad 45 14169 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Briem, Hans Baumhauser Weg 41a 28279 Bremen / DE | 06 /
Bömer, Ulf Leipziger Str. 49 16548 Glienicke/Nordbahn / DE | [2007/51] | Application number, filing date | 06090109.7 | 13.06.2006 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867648 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P9/00, A61P35/00, C07D213/85, C07F5/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D213/85 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/35] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Substituierte Pyrazolopyridine, ihre Herstellung und ihre medizinische Verwendung | [2007/51] | English: | Substituted aminopyrazolopyridines and salts thereof, their preparations and pharmaceutical compositions comprising them. | [2007/51] | French: | Pyrazolopyridines substitués, leur préparation et leur utilisation médicale | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 07.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2269943 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 36 * compounds V;; claim 17 *; | [AD]WO2004113304 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [AD] 1-42 * page 1, line 4 - line 29; example 176 *; | [AD]WO2006050109 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [AD] 1-42 * claims; examples;scheme 2 *; | [A] - D.H. ALBERT ET AL., "Preclinical activity of ABT-869, a multitargeted receptor tyrosine kinase inhibitor", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CANCER RESEARCH, US, (200604), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 995 - 1006, XP002403181 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * | [X] - KORBUKH, I. A. ET AL, "Synthesis of a riboside of 4-chloropyrazolo[3,4-b]pyridine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1972:72737, URL: STN, XP002403593 [X] 36 * abstract * | [X] - H. DORN ET AL., "Allgemeine Synthesen und rationelle Strukturparameter isomerer Derivate von [3,4]-kondensierten Pyrazolen", JOURNAL FÜR PRAKTISCHE CHEMIE, (1979), vol. 321, no. 6, pages 881 - 898, XP002403590 [X] 36 * compounds 20 * | [X] - H. DORN ET AL., "Eindeutige Synthese des 4,7-dihydro-4-oxo-1H-pyrazolo[3,4-b]pyridins", JOURNAL FÜR PRAKTISCHE CHEMIE, (1982), vol. 324, no. 4, pages 557 - 562, XP002403591 [X] 36 * compound 5 * | [X] - GRAVEL M ET AL, "Universal Solid-Phase Approach for the Immobilization, Derivatization, and Resin-to Resin Transfer Reactions of Boronic Acids", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (20011129), vol. 67, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3 - 15, XP002211041 [X] 37 * table 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo0106501 | [X] - MIYAZAKI Y ET AL, "Novel 4-amino-furo[2,3-d]pyrimidines as Tie-2 and VEGFR2 dual inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (20050502), vol. 15, no. 9, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2203 - 2207, XP004851599 [X] 37 * prep. of compounds 7: reagents and conditions step e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2005.03.034 |