EP1813647 - Polyester moulding materials containing maleimide copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] | 08.06.2012 | Change - request for examination | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Assmann, Jens BASF Aktiengesellschaft Augartenstr. 95 68165, Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Weber, Martin BASF Aktiengesellschaft Diedesfelder Str. 26 67487, Maikammer / DE | 03 /
Eipper, Andreas BASF Aktiengesellschaft Von Sturmfederstr. 30a 67067, Ludwigshafen / DE | [2007/31] | Application number, filing date | 06101069.0 | 31.01.2006 | [2007/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813647 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L67/02 (EP);
C08L35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L35/00 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Polyesterformmassen enthaltend Maleinimid-Copolymere | [2007/31] | English: | Polyester moulding materials containing maleimide copolymers | [2007/31] | French: | Matières de moulage en polyester contenant des copolymères maleimide | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2006 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 02.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/28] | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0042737 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,11,12,16 * sentence 10 - sentence 11 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 17 * * page 8, line 28 - line 33 * * examples 2,3 * * claims 1,3,6,7,9 * * page 8, column 28 - column 33 * * examples 2,3 * [Y] 4,9,12-19; | [X]US4542187 (DEAN BARRY D [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9,12,16 * examples 1,3-6 * * claims 1,5,6,8,18 *; | [Y]EP0357459 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [Y] 4,9 * page 3, line 5 - line 13 * * examples 4,7-10 * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0497282 (UNITIKA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9,12,16 * page 2, line 1 * * page 6, line 19 * * examples 1-6 * * claims 1,4,6,8 *; | [Y]US5179162 (KATO KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 12,16 * examples 3,9 *; | [Y]US5424380 (DOI TORU [JP]) [Y] 12-19 * column 1, line 15 - line 20 * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 5 ** examples 18-21 * |