|
24.02.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.02.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.02.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.04.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.02.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.06.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |