EP1736528 - Process for increasing the oxidative stability of biodiesel. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states DEGUSSA AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asbahr, Hark-Oluf Raiffeisenstraße 3 67161, Gönnheim / DE | 02 /
Bomba, Thomas Hauptstraße 171 67127, Rödersheim / DE | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rubensstraße 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06101504.6 | 10.02.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | DE20051015474 | 04.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005015474 | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1736528 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1736528 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/183, C10L10/00, C10L1/02 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
C10L1/1832 (EP,US);
E03D1/14 (KR);
C10L1/198 (EP,US);
C10L10/00 (EP,US);
E03D1/34 (KR);
E03D5/10 (KR);
E03D2001/147 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Oxidationsstabilität von Biodiesel | [2006/52] | English: | Process for increasing the oxidative stability of biodiesel. | [2006/52] | French: | Procédé d'augmentation de la stabilité à l'oxydation d'un biodiesel. | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 08.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2275175 (CLOUD GOULD H) [A] 7* the whole document *; | [A]GB753794 (UNIVERSAL OIL PROD CO) [A] 1-3,5-7 * page 1, line 77 - page 2, line 99; example 1; claims 1-13 *; | [YA]GB796603 (ICI LTD) [Y] 3 * page 2, line 13 - line 46; claims 1-18; tables 1,2,4 * [A] 1,2,4-7; | [A]FR1530056 (ETHYL CORP) [A] 1-7 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 4 *; | [A]EP0626442 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [A] 7 * page 15, line 4 - line 15; claims 1,2,9,13,14 * * page 23, line 53 - page 24, line 27 *; | [Y]US6475252 (HENEGHAN SHAWN P [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 19; claims 1,5-7,11-13,17-19,23,24 *; | [XA]WO03091365 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [X] 7 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 5; claims 1-5,9,11 * * page 12, line 10 - line 12 * * page 13, line 10 - line 23 * [A] 1-6; | [DXY]DE10252714 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0009]; claims 1-7 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]WO2004069964 (CHEVRON USA INC [US], et al) [Y] 4 * page 7, line 29 - line 30; claims 1-4,6,8-10,12-16,23-31,33 * * page 8, line 11 - line 24 * | Examination | US3166509 | by applicant | EP0189049 | DE10252714 | WO2004044104 | DE10252715 |