EP1661459 - Herbicidal mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zagar, Cyrill BASF Aktiengesellschaft Untere Clignetstrasse 8 68167 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Nuyken, Wessel BASF Aktiengesellschaft Keltenstrasse 1 67166 Otterstadt / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Oskar BASF Aktiengesellschaft Greifengasse 15 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 04 /
Jäger, Karl-Friedrich BASF Aktiengesellschaft Weinbietstrasse 18 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
Westphalen, Karl-Otto BASF Aktiengesellschaft Zum Pfauenturm 17 67346 Speyer / DE | [2006/22] | Application number, filing date | 06110045.9 | 30.08.2001 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | DE2000143121 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10043121 | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1661459 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1661459 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A01N47/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N43/90, A01N43/653, A01N43/58, A01N43/54, A01N43/40, A01N39/04, A01N39/02, A01N37/48, A01N37/46, A01N37/40, A01N33/22 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N47/38, A01N47/36, A01N43/90, A01N43/80, A01N43/653, A01N43/58, A01N43/56, A01N43/54, A01N43/40, A01N41/10, A01N37/48, A01N37/46, A01N37/40, A01N37/38, A01N37/36, A01N37/20, A01N33/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | 07.12.2006 | LT | 07.12.2006 | LV | 07.12.2006 | MK | 07.12.2006 | RO | 07.12.2006 | SI | 07.12.2006 | Title | German: | Herbizide Mischungen | [2006/22] | English: | Herbicidal mixtures | [2006/22] | French: | Mélanges herbicides | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01980303.0 / EP1315420 | Divisional application(s) | EP07109418.9 / EP1817958 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO0135741 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-11 * page 15, paragraph 3 ** page 17 - page 18 *; | [E]WO03015520 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,3-11 * page 16, line 5 * * page 18, line 11 * * page 20, line 23 * |