EP1699262 - Hearing aid device with sound storage and corresponding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos GmbH Henri-Dunant-Straße 100 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2015/45] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH Gebbertstrasse 125 91058 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Eghart Franz-Peter-Seifert-Str. 3a 91126 Schwabach / DE | 02 /
Rass, Uwe Gleisshammerstr. 132 90480 Nürnberg / DE | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Berg, Peter Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06110110.1 | 17.02.2006 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | DE20051009530 | 02.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005009530 | [2006/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1699262 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1699262 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
H04R25/70 (EP,US);
H04R2225/41 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | Hörhilfevorrichtung mit automatischer Klangspeicherung und entsprechendes Verfahren | [2006/36] | English: | Hearing aid device with sound storage and corresponding method | [2006/36] | French: | Dispositif de prothèse auditive avec stockage de son et procédé correspondant | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH686646 (ASCOM AUDIOSYS AG [CH]) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [XDAI]DE10152197 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [XD] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * [A] 5,8 [I] 9; | [X]EP1432282 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0029]; claims 1,2 *; | [XDA]EP1453356 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [XD] 1-4,6,7,9 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0025] *[A] 5,8; | [X]AU2004240216 (HEARWORKS PTY LTD) [X] 1,3,6,9 * page 6, line 35 - page 8, line 14 * |