EP1707690 - Working machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | [2013/06] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Masaaki Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd 12-4 Gion 3-chome Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Ochi, Tomohiko Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd 12-4 Gion 3-chome Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2006/40] | 01 /
Murakami, Masaaki Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd 12-4 Gion Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | ||
02 /
Ochi, Tomohiko Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd 12-4 Gion Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP | Representative(s) | Bailey, David Martin Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Bailey, David Martin Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2006/40] | Bailey, David Martin Brookes Batchellor LLP, 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06110165.5 | 20.02.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | JP20050095837 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005095837 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1707690 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1707690 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1707690 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/22 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
E02F9/2275 (EP,US);
E02F9/0875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | Arbeitsmaschine | [2006/40] | English: | Working machine | [2006/40] | French: | Engin de travaux publics | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 20.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2006 | AT | 06.02.2013 | BE | 06.02.2013 | CY | 06.02.2013 | CZ | 06.02.2013 | DK | 06.02.2013 | EE | 06.02.2013 | FI | 06.02.2013 | LT | 06.02.2013 | LV | 06.02.2013 | NL | 06.02.2013 | PL | 06.02.2013 | RO | 06.02.2013 | SE | 06.02.2013 | SI | 06.02.2013 | SK | 06.02.2013 | TR | 06.02.2013 | IE | 20.02.2013 | LU | 20.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | BG | 06.05.2013 | GR | 07.05.2013 | ES | 17.05.2013 | IS | 06.06.2013 | PT | 06.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
BE | 06.02.2013 | ||
CY | 06.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
TR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
BE | 06.02.2013 | ||
CY | 06.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
IE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
BE | 06.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
IE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
BE | 06.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
BE | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
BE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
BE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
BE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.02.2013 | |
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.02.2013 | |
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0321470U (.) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [I]JPH0433757U (.) [I] 1,5 * figure - *; | [A]JPH07229165 (YUTANI JUKO KK) [A] 1,5* abstract *; | [A]JPH07238569 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [ID]JPH11200407 (YUTANI JUKO KK, et al) [ID] 1,5 * figure 12 *; | [A]JP2002180497 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004162405 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [XA]JP2005068962 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [A] 2,4; | [E]JP2006193949 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [E] 1,5 * figures 9,10 * |