EP1669211 - Printing unit of a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/24] | Printing units of a printing machine | ||
[2008/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christel, Ralf Erlenweg 2 96132 Schlüsselfeld / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Oliver Würzburger Str. 21 97209 Veitshöchheim / DE | 03 /
Schaschek, Karl Schulstr. 23 97289 Thüngen / DE | [2006/24] | Application number, filing date | 06110191.1 | 09.04.2003 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | DE2002117402 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10217402 | DE2002137205 | 14.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10237205 | [2006/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1669211 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1669211 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1669211 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41N10/04, B41N7/00, B41F13/08, B41F7/12 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
B41F13/085 (EP,US);
B41F30/04 (EP,US);
B41F7/12 (EP,US);
B41N10/02 (EP,US);
B41N10/04 (EP,US);
B41N2207/02 (EP,US);
B41N2207/14 (EP,US);
B41N2210/02 (EP,US);
B41N2210/04 (EP,US);
B41N2210/10 (EP,US);
B41N2210/14 (EP,US);
B41N7/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Title | German: | Druckwerk einer Druckmaschine | [2008/39] | English: | Printing unit of a printing machine | [2008/39] | French: | Unité d'impression d'une machine à imprimer | [2008/39] |
Former [2006/24] | Druckwerke einer Druckmaschine | ||
Former [2006/24] | Printing units of a printing machine | ||
Former [2006/24] | Unités d'impression d'une machine à imprimer | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 29.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03729822.1 / EP1494873 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IE | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | PT | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | SI | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | AT | 09.04.2009 | LU | 09.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | HU | 01.07.2009 | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/43] | CY | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
TR | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
AT | 09.04.2009 | ||
LU | 09.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
AT | 09.04.2009 | ||
LU | 09.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
HU | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
AT | 09.04.2009 | ||
LU | 09.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
AT | 09.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
AT | 09.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CZ | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SI | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH426903 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1,5,2-4 * page 1, line 41 - line 47 * * page 1, line 56 - line 62 * * page 5, line 7 - line 16 * * page 5, line 43 - line 53 * * page 5, line 97 - line 104 * * page 6, line 20 - line 27 * * page 7, line 87 - line 101 * * page 8, line 1 - line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]DE1546788 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1,5 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 5, lines 16-23 * * page 6, lines 4-21 *; | [A]US3887750 (DUCKETT JOHN C, et al) [A] 1,5 * column 1, lines 5-22 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 39; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5884559 (OKUBO HIROMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1,5* column 15, lines 1-67; figure 3; example 1; table 1 *; | [PX]EP1208997 (CONTITECH ELASTOMER BESCH GMBH [DE]) [PX] 5,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0017]; figure 1 * |