EP1759995 - Equipment and method for packaging packets of products in bags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CT PACK S.r.l. Via Argine Volano N. 355/D 44030 FOSSALTA DI COPPARO - FERRARA / IT | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davì, Daniele Via Degli Ippocastani 19 44100 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
Coreggioli, Giorgio Via De Sica 4 44100 Ferrara / IT | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/41] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/10] | Coppo, Alessandro, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A., Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06110280.2 | 22.02.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI01608 | 29.08.2005 Original published format: IT MI20051608 | [2007/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759995 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65B5/02, B65B5/06, B65B5/10, B65B43/56 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
B65B5/022 (EP,US);
B65B43/56 (EP,US);
B65B5/067 (EP,US);
B65B5/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verpacken von Paketen mit Produkten in Beuteln | [2007/10] | English: | Equipment and method for packaging packets of products in bags | [2007/10] | French: | Machine et procédé pour emballer des paquets avec des produits dans des sachets | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1110075 (GEORG SCHWANECK) [A] 3,5,8* column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 17; figure - *; | [A]US3727373 (MAC LEOD N) [A] 1,4,7,9 * column 2, line 30 - column 5, line 30; figure - *; | [A]US3952480 (NORDSTROM JOHN E) [A] 1,3-5,7-9 * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 3; figure - *; | [Y]US4703608 (KOVACS LLOYD [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-10 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 54; figure - *; | [A]US5428938 (DAVIS ROBERT [CA]) [A] 1,3-10 * column 2, line 20 - column 5, line 16; figure - *; | [Y]EP0884243 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [Y] 1,3-10 * column 5, line 44 - column 8, line 25; figure - * |