EP1717645 - Intermediate transfer member having a compressible layer and an external heating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. Legal Dept., 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holstun, Clayton L. 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, CA 92127-1899 / US | 02 /
Heesen Jr., Vincent 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, CA 92127-1899 / US | 03 /
Aronhime, Marc Kiryat Weizmann, PO Box 150 76101, Rehovot / IL | 04 /
Lavon, Amiran 21/3 Itzhak Sadeh Street 59563, Bat Yam / IL | 05 /
Kozmiski, Stanley J 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, CA 92127-1899 / US | [2019/19] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Holstun, Clayton L. 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, CA 92127-1899 / US | ||
02 /
Heesen Jr., Vincent 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, CA 92127-1899 / US | |||
03 /
Aronhime, Marc Kiryat Weizmann, PO Box 150 76101, Rehovot / IL | |||
04 /
Lavon, Amiran 21/3 Itzhak Sadeh Street 59563, Bat Yam / IL | |||
05 /
Kozmiski, Stanley J 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, CA 92127-1899 / US | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | [2019/19] |
Former [2006/52] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al Electronic Intellectual Property Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06110442.8 | 27.02.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | US20050093466 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: US 93466 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717645 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1717645 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717645 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G03G15/1685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/19] |
Former [2007/41] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zwischenübertragungselement mit komprimierbarer Schicht und von außen beheizt | [2006/44] | English: | Intermediate transfer member having a compressible layer and an external heating | [2006/44] | French: | Elément de transfert intermédiaire avec une couche compressible et un élément de chauffage externe | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5883876 ; | [XA]JPS5885463 ; | [A]JPH0915933 ; | [A]JP2001060044 ; | [X]US5815783 (LIOR ISHAIAU [IL], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 28 * * column 8, lines 17-23; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US6141026 (DOMOTO GERALD A [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9 * column 7, lines 33-53; figure 1 *; | [DA]US6584294 (LANDA BENZION [IL], et al) [DA] 1-9* column 9, paragraph 1 - column 10, paragraph 42; figure 3 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830809), vol. 007, no. 180, Database accession no. (P - 215), & JP58083876 A 19830519 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1,7 * abstract * [A] 9 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830813), vol. 007, no. 184, Database accession no. (P - 216), & JP58085463 A 19830521 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1,7 * abstract * [A] 9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09015933 A 19970117 (CANON INC) [A] 8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001060044 A 20010306 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 8 * abstract * | by applicant | US4548858 | US5754931 | US5815783 | US6438352 | US6584294 |